Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.28.167

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.28.167
Case Number: 1:2019cv21201
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE via mail. (amb)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The case remains closed. The Clerk of Court SHALL administratively close this case. All future hearings are CANCELLED and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of John Doe by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave for Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Philip Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order)(Walker, Rachel)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to Show Cause by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Walker, Rachel)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/10/2019, Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2019 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE via US mail (amb)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.28.167. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11516478, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.28.167
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.28.167
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?