Driessen v. University of Miami School of Law Children & Youth Law Clinic et al
Plaintiff: Rochelle Y. Driessen
Defendant: Emily C. Moises Day Training Center and University of Miami School of Law Children & Youth Law Clinic
Case Number: 1:2019cv21224
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Emily C. Moises Day Training Center, University of Miami School of Law Children & Youth Law Clinic, filed by Rochelle Y. Driessen.(dj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2019: #1 Exhibit) (dj).
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #4 Order Dismissing Case mailed to Plaintiff. (drz)
April 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per order de #4 Amended Complaint due by 4/12/2019. (drz)
April 2, 2019 Case Reopened. Case closed in error. (drz)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rochelle Y. Driessen. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rochelle Y. Driessen. (mc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emily C. Moises Day Training Center, University of Miami School of Law Children & Youth Law Clinic. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Rochelle Y. Driessen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driessen v. University of Miami School of Law Children & Youth Law Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Y. Driessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily C. Moises Day Training Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Miami School of Law Children & Youth Law Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?