Sea Trade Financial Corp. v. Boltorn Investment Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Sea Trade Financial Corp.
Defendant: Franciscus Van Rossum and Boltorn Investment Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv21276
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 7/22/2019 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for an evidentiary hearing and Report and Recommendation on #21 Plaintiff Sea Trade Financial Corp.'s Motion for Default Final Judgment Against Defendants, Boltorn Investment LTD and Franciscus van Rossum. Plaintiff's evidence in support of its Motion for Default Final Judgment shall, at a minimum, explain the complex scenario of selling and leasing standby letters of credit, which is at the heart of Plaintiff's claims. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 7/2/2019. (gie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants, Bolton Investments LTD. and Franciscus Van Rossum by Sea Trade Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Christian)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On June 20, 2019, the Clerk entered default #19 against Defendant Franciscus Van Rossum for failure to respond to the Complaint or otherwise appear in this action. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff is provided until and including July 1, 2019 to file a Motion for Entry of FINAL Default Judgment, together with appropriate affidavits and documentation, against Defendant or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff is instructed that a Motion for Default Judgment must be accompanied by an affidavit of non-military status as to Defendant, pursuant to Soldiers' and Sailors' Civil Relief Act of 1940, 50 U.S.C. Appendix, Section 501 et seq., as well as an affidavit certifying that Defendant is neither an infant nor an incompetent person, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(b)(2). This entry constitutes the ENDORSED ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 6/20/2019. (gie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 Clerks Entry of Default as to Franciscus Van Rossum - Motions Terminated: #18 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/20/2019. (ls)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Franciscus Van Rossum by Sea Trade Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rodriguez, Christian)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On June 18, 2019, the Clerk entered default #16 against Defendant Boltorn Investment Ltd. for failure to respond to the Complaint or otherwise appear in this action. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff is provided until and including July 1, 2019 to file a Motion for Entry of FINAL Default Judgment, together with appropriate affidavits and documentation, against Defendant or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. This entry constitutes the ENDORSED ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 6/19/2019. (gie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 Clerks Entry of Default as to Boltorn Investment Ltd. - Motions Terminated: #14 Renewed Verified Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/18/2019. (ls)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad by Sea Trade Financial Corp.. Franciscus Van Rossum served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rodriguez, Christian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Boltorn Investment Ltd. by Sea Trade Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rodriguez, Christian)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad by Sea Trade Financial Corp.. Boltorn Investment Ltd. served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rodriguez, Christian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER by Clerk of Non-Entry of Default re #11 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Boltorn Investment Ltd., Franciscus Van Rossum. Reason: Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed OR Waiver of Service Executed - has NOT been entered on docket. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/12/2019. (ls)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Boltorn Investment Ltd. by Sea Trade Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rodriguez, Christian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of International Services as to Boltorn Investments (ls)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of International Services as to Francisco Van Rossum (ls)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Franciscus Van Rossum, (ls)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Boltorn Investment Ltd., (ls)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Sea Trade Financial Corp. re #1 Complaint, filed by Sea Trade Financial Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Rodriguez, Christian)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E Wolff on behalf of Sea Trade Financial Corp. (Wolff, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Sea Trade Financial Corp. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rodriguez, Christian) Modified Text on 4/8/2019 (ls).
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (lh)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11533211, filed by Sea Trade Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Composite D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Composite F, #7 Exhibit Composite G)(Rodriguez, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sea Trade Financial Corp. v. Boltorn Investment Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscus Van Rossum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boltorn Investment Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Trade Financial Corp.
Represented By: Christian Enrique Rodriguez
Represented By: David E Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?