Foster v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Mr Lawrence Foster and Lawrence Foster
Defendant: United State of America and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv21363
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald L Graham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Lawrence Foster. (Malove, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of Foster's Post-Arrest Statement, #2 Exhibit Kipness Interview Notes, #3 Exhibit Lason Interview Notes)(Davidson, H.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Robert Malove in the amount of $5.00 on 05/13/2019 re 5 Clerks Notice of Reimbursement of Overpayment of Filing Fee (mua)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing government to file a response to #1 . Movant to file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Show Cause Response due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 5/6/19. See attached document for full details. (gfw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by H. Ron Davidson on behalf of United States of America. Attorney H. Ron Davidson added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Davidson, H.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Lawrence Foster civil cover sheet (Malove, Robert)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert David Malove on behalf of Lawrence Foster (Malove, Robert)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Reimbursement of Filing Fee. The Clerk will refund $5.00, receipt #113C-11547683, re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus dated 4/10/2019. (No fee required for a 28 USC 2255 case) (jc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong docket event when docketing. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. (ebz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate Sentence (2255) . NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 13-20063-CR-GRAHAM) Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 113C-11547683, filed by Lawrence Foster.(Malove, Robert) Modified text event on 4/11/2019 (jc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: H. Ron Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Lawrence Foster
Represented By: Robert David Malove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Foster
Represented By: Robert David Malove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?