Metschlaw, P.A. v. Magic Burgers, LLC. et al

Plaintiff: Metschlaw, P.A. and Lawrence R. Metsch
Defendant: Magic Burgers, LLC, Pop Florida Properties, LLC, Sun Steaks, LLC, Florida Pop, LLC and Mr. Lawrence R. Metsch
Case Number: 1:2019cv21453
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 Clerks Notice to Filer re #23 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #20 Amended Complaint (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, With Prejudice, or Alternative Motion to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law) MOTION to Stay. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (jas)
July 6, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #20 Amended Complaint (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, With Prejudice, or Alternative Motion to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law) filed by Lawrence R. Metsch, Metschlaw, P.A.. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (Metsch, Lawrence)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #20 Amended Complaint (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, With Prejudice, or Alternative Motion to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law) by Florida Pop, LLC, Magic Burgers, LLC, Pop Florida Properties, LLC, Sun Steaks, LLC. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint (with exhibits), #2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint (w/out exhibits), #3 Exhibit 2 - Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint and Amended Counterclaim))(Marks, Howard). Added MOTION to Stay on 7/8/2019 (jas).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2019., Discovery due by 8/27/2019., Fact Discovery due by 8/27/2019., Expert Discovery due by 8/27/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 8/27/2019., Mediation Deadline 9/10/2019., In Limine Motions due by 9/18/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 9/18/2019., Motions due by 9/18/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/9/2019., Jury Trial set for 1/6/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 12/17/2019 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 9/10/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #18 Motion to Dismiss. See Amended Complaint at ECF No. #20 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Metschlaw, P.A., Lawrence R. Metsch.(Metsch, Lawrence)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Florida Pop, LLC, Magic Burgers, LLC, Pop Florida Properties, LLC, Sun Steaks, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Magic Fries Holdings, LLC for Magic Burgers, LLC; Other Affiliate SunCo Restaurants, LLC for Sun Steaks, LLC; Other Affiliate Pop Restaurant Holdings, LLC for Florida Pop, LLC; Other Affiliate Pronto Realty, LP for Pop Florida Properties, LLC (Marks, Howard)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint, With Prejudice, or Alternative Motion to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law) by Florida Pop, LLC, Magic Burgers, LLC, Pop Florida Properties, LLC, Sun Steaks, LLC. Responses due by 7/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint and Amended Counterclaim)(Marks, Howard)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by All Defendants by June 25, 2019. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Metschlaw, P.A.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint (Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) by Florida Pop, LLC, Magic Burgers, LLC, Pop Florida Properties, LLC, Sun Steaks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order on Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint))(Marks, Howard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sheena Thakrar on behalf of Florida Pop, LLC, Magic Burgers, LLC, Pop Florida Properties, LLC, Sun Steaks, LLC. Attorney Sheena Thakrar added to party Florida Pop, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sheena Thakrar added to party Magic Burgers, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sheena Thakrar added to party Pop Florida Properties, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sheena Thakrar added to party Sun Steaks, LLC(pty:dft). (Thakrar, Sheena)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, #11 Summons Issued (Acceptance of Service) filed by Florida Pop, LLC, Magic Burgers, LLC, Pop Florida Properties, LLC, Sun Steaks, LLC. (Marks, Howard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard Scott Marks on behalf of Florida Pop, LLC, Magic Burgers, LLC, Pop Florida Properties, LLC, Sun Steaks, LLC. Attorney Howard Scott Marks added to party Florida Pop, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Howard Scott Marks added to party Magic Burgers, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Howard Scott Marks added to party Pop Florida Properties, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Howard Scott Marks added to party Sun Steaks, LLC(pty:dft). (Marks, Howard)
May 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lawrence R. Metsch, Metschlaw, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(Metsch, Lawrence)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Florida Pop, LLC, Magic Burgers, LLC, Pop Florida Properties, LLC, Sun Steaks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(ebz)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE within seven (7) days of perfecting service upon Defendants, Plaintiffs shall file proof of such service with the Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Notice (Other). Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (jas)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Civil Color Sheet by Lawrence R. Metsch, Metschlaw, P.A. (Metsch, Lawrence) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (jas).
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties Joint Scheduling Report due within 21 days of an appearance by a Defendant. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 19, 2019 Case Reopened per order on DE #6 (jao)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; granting #5 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re #1 Complaint, #4 Order Dismissing Case by Lawrence R. Metsch, Metschlaw, P.A.. (Metsch, Lawrence)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Magic Burgers, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11563839, filed by Metschlaw, P.A..(Metsch, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metschlaw, P.A. v. Magic Burgers, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Burgers, LLC
Represented By: Howard Scott Marks
Represented By: Sheena Thakrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pop Florida Properties, LLC
Represented By: Howard Scott Marks
Represented By: Sheena Thakrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Steaks, LLC
Represented By: Howard Scott Marks
Represented By: Sheena Thakrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Pop, LLC
Represented By: Howard Scott Marks
Represented By: Sheena Thakrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Lawrence R. Metsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metschlaw, P.A.
Represented By: Lawrence Richard Metsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence R. Metsch
Represented By: Lawrence Richard Metsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?