Weiss v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Douglas Weiss
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv21552
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #12 the parties' joint motion to extend the briefing deadlines to the Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Plaintiff's response is due on July 15, 2019 and the Defendant's reply is due on July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 6/24/2019. (jaa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henninger, Ursula)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by General Motors LLC. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Henninger, Ursula)
May 14, 2019 Reset Deadlines General Motors LLC answer due 6/17/2019 Per DE#10. (cqs)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #8 the Defendant's motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. The Defendant's response is due on or before June 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (jaa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC identifying Other Affiliate General Motors Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate General Motors Company for General Motors LLC (Henninger, Ursula)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by General Motors LLC. Attorney Ursula Marie Henninger added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henninger, Ursula)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Douglas Weiss. General Motors LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Tapley, Frank)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office - Miami) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (cds)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC. (cds)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11581627, filed by Douglas Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Tapley, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiss v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Weiss
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Ursula Marie Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?