Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv21600
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC (Wickhorst, George)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC. (Wickhorst, George)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. ( Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2019 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro). ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 5/31/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United Healthcare Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Alter, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11589871, filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" Declaration of Mabel S. Fairley, #3 Exhibit "B" State Court Action)(Alter, Daniel) Modified on 4/26/2019 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minimally Invasive Spine Center of South Florida, LLC
Represented By: George William Wickhorst, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?