Camejo v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Carlos A. Camejo
Defendant: Opulence Investments LLC and Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 1:2019cv21664
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #18 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, #19 Transmittal Letter Sent. (drz) Modified on 6/21/2019 (drz).
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 Transmittal Letter Sent with Transmittal and Order to: 11th Judicial Circuit in and for Miami Dade County. State Court Case Number: 14-026927-CA-01 (amb) (amb).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Remand to State Court. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: #12 Second EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by Carlos A. Camejo, #7 Corrected EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included MOTION to Strike filed by Carlos A. Camejo, #4 First EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Stephen Gutierrez Esq filed by Carlos A. Camejo, #17 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Carlos A. Camejo, #5 Amended EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by Carlos A. Camejo. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Bolz, Henry)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Carlos A. Camejo. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summon(s)). (jas) Modified text on 5/24/2019 (jc).
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry H Bolz, IV on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank NA. Attorney Henry H Bolz, IV added to party Wells Fargo Bank NA(pty:dft). (Bolz, Henry)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica L Haddad Forbes on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank NA. Attorney Monica L Haddad Forbes added to party Wells Fargo Bank NA(pty:dft). (Haddad Forbes, Monica)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT in response to Order dated 5/2/19 by Carlos A. Camejo (Gutierrez, Stephen)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 Second EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Carlos A. Camejo. Responses due by 5/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certification)(Gutierrez, Stephen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents by Carlos A. Camejo. (drz)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 5/8/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100186824. (vt)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Removal Status Report due May 15, 2019. Failure to provide the information requested may result in remand of the action. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corrected EMERGENCY MOTION for Injunction with Certification of Emergency included and/or MOTION to Strike by Carlos A. Camejo. Responses due by 5/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Emergency)(Gutierrez, Stephen) Modified text and added the event MOTION to Strike on 5/3/2019 (jc).
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 First EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Stephen Gutierrez Esq and #5 Amended EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included . Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the documents as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (jc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Amended EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Carlos A. Camejo. Responses due by 5/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Gutierrez, Stephen) .
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 First EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Stephen Gutierrez Esq by Carlos A. Camejo. Responses due by 5/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification CERTIFICATE OF EMRGENCY, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET REMOVING JURISDICTION FROM STATE COURT)(Gutierrez, Stephen)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos A. Camejo. (ar2)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Carlos A. Camejo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summon(s))(ar2) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camejo v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opulence Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Clarence Harold Houston, III
Represented By: Sara F. Holladay-Tobias
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Represented By: Monica L Haddad Forbes
Represented By: Henry H Bolz, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Camejo
Represented By: Stephen Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?