Havana Docks Corporation v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: Havana Docks Corporation
Defendant: Carnival Corporation,d/b/a Carnival Cruise Lines, a foreign corporation and Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv21724
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Chris M McAliley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 22 U.S.C. ยง 6082
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 36 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on the Motion to Dismiss by Carnival Corporation. Responses due by 7/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singer, Stuart)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply by 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 25, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Carnival Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singer, Stuart)
June 24, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, filed by Havana Docks Corporation. Replies due by 7/1/2019. (Martinez, Roberto)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney George J. Fowler, III. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for George J. Fowler, III. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11741953 by Carnival Corporation. Responses due by 7/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Llamas, Luis)
June 18, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Luis Emilio Llamas on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Luis Emilio Llamas added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Llamas, Luis)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRINGMEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2019., Discovery due by 6/30/2020., Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2019., Mediation Deadline 7/14/2020., In Limine Motions due by 7/22/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2020., Motions due by 7/22/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/13/2020., Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 10/20/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ( Mediation Deadline 7/14/2020.). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per de#28 . Discovery due by 6/30/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2020. (drz)
June 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2019., Discovery due by 6/30/2020.,Expert Discovery due by 06/30/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2019., Mediation Deadline 7/14/2020., In Limine Motions due by 7/22/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2020., Motions due by 7/22/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/13/2020., Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 10/20/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ( Mediation Deadline 7/14/2020.), Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Modified on 6/17/2019 (drz).
June 14, 2019 Filing 27 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carnival Corporation (Singer, Stuart)
June 14, 2019 Filing 26 Joint Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Havana Docks Corporation (Martinez, Roberto)
June 14, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Havana Docks Corporation (Martinez, Roberto)
June 14, 2019 Filing 24 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Havana Docks Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Roberto)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss shall not exceed 25 pages. Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response shall not exceed 15 pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 13, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Havana Docks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Roberto)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion by 6/24/2019. Re: #17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, filed by Carnival Corporation. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 20 Clerks Notice to Filer re #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion to Dismiss re #17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Havana Docks Corporation. Responses due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Roberto) Modified Relief on 6/6/2019 (ls).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for all further proceedings. Motions referred to Judge Chris M. McAliley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Carnival Corporation. Responses due by 6/13/2019 (Singer, Stuart)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Carnival Corporation (Singer, Stuart)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Carnival Corporation. Attorney Stuart Harold Singer added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singer, Stuart)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Havana Docks Corporation. Carnival Corporation served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Martinez, Roberto)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORRECTED ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Marcia G. Cooke and Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman recused. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for all further proceedings. See DE #9 Order. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/6/2019. (vjk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (dj)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Marcia G. Cooke recused. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Havana Docks Corporation (Martinez, Roberto)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 5/2/2019 in the amount of $ 6,548.00, receipt number FLS100186438. (vt)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Wrong Event Selected. The Filer selected Complaint.The docket text has been modified to Complaint Re: 22 U.S.C.A. 6082, liability for trafficking in confiscated property claimed by United States nationals. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) Modified on 5/2/2019 (drz).
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons not issued for the following reason- filing fee has not paid. (drz)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Insufficient filing fee paid. Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee and electronically pay the correct fees of $6948.00 within 24 hours. (drz)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Re: Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity Act of 1996 against Carnival Corporation,d/b/a Carnival Cruise Lines, a foreign corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11607722, filed by Havana Docks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Martinez, Roberto) Modified on 5/2/2019 to reflect correct filing date (bb). Modified on 5/2/2019 (drz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havana Docks Corporation v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Havana Docks Corporation
Represented By: Roberto Martinez
Represented By: Francisco Raul Maderal, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Casey
Represented By: Lazaro Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation,d/b/a Carnival Cruise Lines, a foreign corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Luis Emilio Llamas
Represented By: George J. Fowler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?