Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc. v. Linnaeus, Inc.

Plaintiff: Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc.
Defendant: Linnaeus, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv21837
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #12 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Linnaeus, Inc. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Linnaeus, Inc. by Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Elliot)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc. Plaintiffs Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties (Zimmerman, Elliot)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. see DE #8 for image (cbr)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc. re #6 Summons Issued, #5 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint,,, #7 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines , SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc.. Linnaeus, Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Zimmerman, Elliot)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that on or before 8/5/2019 Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Alias Summons Issued as to Linnaeus, Inc.. (cbr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc. re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,, Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk to Issue Alias Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Rejection of Service, #3 Summon(s) Alias Summons) (Zimmerman, Elliot)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (by u.s. mail) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Linnaeus, Inc.. (mee)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Linnaeus, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11618924, payment transferred from : 1:19-cv-21819 Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc. v. Linnaeus, Inc., filed by Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Software License Agreement, #2 Exhibit A-1 Exhibit A to Software License Agreement, #3 Exhibit A-2 Exhibit B to Software License Agreement, #4 Exhibit A-3 Exhibit C to Software License Agreement, #5 Exhibit A-4 Exhibit D to Software License Agreement, #6 Exhibit A-5 Exhibit E to Software License Agreement, #7 Exhibit A-6 Addendum A to Software License Agreement, #8 Exhibit B Termination Agreement, #9 Exhibit C Defendant Linnaeus Delaware Secretary of State Corporate Printout, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summon(s) Summons)(Zimmerman, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc. v. Linnaeus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linnaeus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Optometric Physicians Network, Inc.
Represented By: Elliot Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?