Goldberg v. Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Michael I. Goldberg
Defendant: Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP and David B. Gordon
Case Number: 1:2019cv21862
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael I. Goldberg. Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Kellogg, Jason)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael I. Goldberg. David B. Gordon waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Kellogg, Jason)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael I. Goldberg. David B. Gordon waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Kellogg, Jason)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Darrin P. Gayles recused. Case reassigned to Judge Marcia G. Cooke for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David B. Gordon, David B. Gordon, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP. (kpe)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David B. Gordon, David B. Gordon, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11627680, filed by Michael I. Goldberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Schneider, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldberg v. Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael I. Goldberg
Represented By: Jeffrey Clark Schneider
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?