Pierre v. Secretary, F.D.O.C.

Plaintiff: William Pierre
Defendant: Secretary, F.D.O.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv21883
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
2 Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $5.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/21/2019. (lt00)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Pierre. (cqs)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS of filing Miami-Dade County Case No. F07-857 to be made part of the instant record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Online Trial Docket, #2 Order Denying Rule 3.80) (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 6/23/2019. Motions due by 6/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Not Paid/No IFP), filed by William Pierre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierre v. Secretary, F.D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, F.D.O.C.
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?