Olah et al v. Notorious Wines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kim Hartmann and Gigi Olah
Defendant: Notorious Wines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv21911
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #24 Amended Complaint, by Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ostroff, Eric)
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Notorious Wines, Inc. (Cobos, Evelyn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #24 Amended Complaint, by Notorious Wines, Inc.. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Cobos, Evelyn)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 6/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss. In light of Plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint, the motion to dismiss #10 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/11/2019. (dpa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Notorious Wines, Inc., filed by Gigi Olah, Kim Hartmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Ostroff, Eric)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah. (Ostroff, Eric)
June 4, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to #5 Memorandum, by Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah. (Ostroff, Eric)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ostroff, Eric)
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 Plaintiff's REPLY to #14 Memorandum by Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah. (Ostroff, Eric)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ostroff, Eric)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Notorious Wines, Inc.. Replies due by 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cobos, Evelyn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Notorious Wines, Inc. re #11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, of Filing Copies of State Court Records and Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miami-Dade County Docket Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pltfs' Mtn for Appointment of a Receiver or Custodian, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pltfs' Motion to (A) Set Hearing on Motion for Appointment of a Receiver or Custodian (B) Expedite Discovery, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pltfs' First Request for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pltfs' First Request for Admissions, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pltfs' First Set of Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit 9 - Pltfs' Notice of Hearing, #10 Exhibit 10 - Pltfs' Notice of Deposition of Notorious Wines, Inc., #11 Exhibit 11 - Pltfs' Notice of Service of Court Documents upon Deft, #12 Exhibit 12 - Pltfs' Notice of Service of Court Documents upon Deft with Affidavit of Service, #13 Exhibit 13 - Deft's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Cobos, Evelyn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT (Removal) by Notorious Wines, Inc. (Cobos, Evelyn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 Memorandum, by Notorious Wines, Inc.. (Cobos, Evelyn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 Notice (Other), by Notorious Wines, Inc.. (Cobos, Evelyn)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Harold S. Shaftel. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Harold S. Shaftel, Esq. as counsel of record for Defendant and allow counsel to be noticed electronically on CM/ECF.Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/22/2019. (js02)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Harold S Shaftel. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11663761. Filing Fee $ 75.00 by Notorious Wines, Inc.. Responses due by 6/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Appear PHV - Harold S. Shaftel)(Cobos, Evelyn)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Notorious Wines, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Cobos, Evelyn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Ostroff, Eric)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Notorious Wines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cobos, Evelyn)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Utibe Inyang Ikpe on behalf of Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah. Attorney Utibe Inyang Ikpe added to party Kim Hartmann(pty:pla), Attorney Utibe Inyang Ikpe added to party Gigi Olah(pty:pla). (Ikpe, Utibe)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan William Segal on behalf of Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah. Attorney Jonathan William Segal added to party Kim Hartmann(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan William Segal added to party Gigi Olah(pty:pla). (Segal, Jonathan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to (A) Set Hearing on Motion to Appoint Receiver or Custodian and (B) Expedite Discovery by Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ostroff, Eric)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Kim Hartmann, Gigi Olah Notice of Filing Motion for Appointment of a Receiver or Custodian. Attorney Eric W. Ostroff added to party Kim Hartmann(pty:pla), Attorney Eric W. Ostroff added to party Gigi Olah(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ostroff, Eric)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (amb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Judicial Dissolution) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11636123, filed by Notorious Wines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cobos, Evelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olah et al v. Notorious Wines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Hartmann
Represented By: Utibe Inyang Ikpe
Represented By: Jonathan William Segal
Represented By: Eric W. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gigi Olah
Represented By: Utibe Inyang Ikpe
Represented By: Jonathan William Segal
Represented By: Eric W. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notorious Wines, Inc.
Represented By: Evelyn Anne Cobos
Represented By: Harold S. Shaftel
Represented By: Francisco Oscar Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?