Ross v. State of Florida

Plaintiff: Torrence Ross
Defendant: State of Florida
Case Number: 1:2019cv21942
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Torrence Ross. Address updated. (kpe)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/10/2019. (br)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/3/2019. (ch1)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Voluntary Dismissal of Instant Action by Torrence Ross. (kpe)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting solely to the extent that the petitioner appears to have no monies to pay the $5.00 filing. However, the petitioner is ordered to file no later than July 6, 2019, a notice, attaching a copy of his inmate account statement certified by the corrections officer having custody over that account showing the account balance for the preceding 6-month period. Failure to do so may result in the vacatur of the grant of pauper status and may result in the dismissal of this action should petitioner fail to pay the $5.00 fee in the alternative. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/6/2019. (lt00)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Torrence Ross. (kpe)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Florida, filed by Torrence Ross.(kpe)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction. Documents 7 , 8 , and 9 Filed in Wrong Case; Documents restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 19-cv-14170. (fbn)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PETITIONER RE RECHARACTERIZATION OF FILING TO BE CONSTRUED AS A PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT 28 U.S.C. 2254. ( Amended Complaint due by 6/24/2019 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Complaint Form) (fbn)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 6/24/2019. Motions due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS ORDER re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Torrence Ross. This Court conducted an initial review of Petitioner's "Emergency" filing and finds that the motion contains no mention of imminent threat or risk of danger to Petitioner. It appears that the motion is entitled as such to expedite a decision on the instant matter. Petitioner's request for habeas relief will be addressed in turn and appropriate orders are forthcoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/24/2019. (lt00)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Emergency Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Not Paid/ No IFP filed), filed by Torrence Ross.(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrence Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?