Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company v. Ramos et al

Plaintiff: Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Steven Ramos, Jorge Daniel, Action Rentals, LLC and Adrian Leon
Case Number: 1:2019cv22069
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Joseph Pardo on behalf of Action Rentals, LLC, Adrian Leon. Attorney Michael Joseph Pardo added to party Action Rentals, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Joseph Pardo added to party Adrian Leon(pty:dft). (Pardo, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pamela Beckham on behalf of Jorge Daniel. Attorney Pamela Beckham added to party Jorge Daniel(pty:dft). (Beckham, Pamela)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike Portions of Respondent, Jorge Daniel's Answer and Affirmative Defenses [DE 12] and Memorandum of Law by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Simon, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Plaintiff's unopposed motion regarding order on clerk's default procedure #16 . Plaintiff's deadline to move for clerk's default against Defendant Ramos is vacated. The Plaintiff must serve Ramos by August 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION Regarding Order on Clerk's Default Procedure re #15 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jacobson, Brian)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on Clerks Default Procedure. Motions due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion:Defendants Action Rentals and Leon's Response/Answer now due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/19/2019. (EGT)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Action Rentals, LLC, Adrian Leon. (Pardo, Stevan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jorge Daniel. Attorney Ronald David Rodman added to party Jorge Daniel(pty:dft). (Rodman, Ronald)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stevan Joseph Pardo on behalf of Action Rentals, LLC, Adrian Leon. Attorney Stevan Joseph Pardo added to party Action Rentals, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stevan Joseph Pardo added to party Adrian Leon(pty:dft). (Pardo, Stevan)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. Steven Ramos served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Jacobson, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Striking Docket Entry by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company (Jacobson, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Summons Returned Executed,. ERROR. Incorrect Service Date Entered; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED. Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then re-file the document using the correct service date. (lbc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. Jorge Daniel served on 5/25/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Jacobson, Brian)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 (STRICKEN PER DE#8)SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. Steven Ramos served on 5/25/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Jacobson, Brian)Text Modified on 6/4/2019 (cqs).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Action Rentals, LLC, Jorge Daniel, Adrian Leon, Steven Ramos. (cds)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Action Rentals, LLC, Jorge Daniel, Adrian Leon, Steven Ramos. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11666296, filed by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Summon(s) Steve Ramos, #6 Summon(s) Adrian Leon, #7 Summon(s) Jorge Daniel, #8 Summon(s) Action Rentals)(Simon, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company v. Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Daniel
Represented By: Pamela Beckham
Represented By: Ronald David Rodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Stevan Joseph Pardo
Represented By: Michael Joseph Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Leon
Represented By: Stevan Joseph Pardo
Represented By: Michael Joseph Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Simon
Represented By: Brian S. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?