Dacosta v. Techno Systems LLC
Plaintiff: Haley Barnett Dacosta
Defendant: Techno Systems LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv22079
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:0451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Haley Barnett Dacosta. Replies due by 7/22/2019. (Levy, Michelle)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion on or before July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #7 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Haley Barnett Dacosta. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Levy, Michelle) Modified Relief on 6/27/2019 (ls).
June 16, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint , MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 7/1/2019) by Techno Systems LLC. (Brooks, Miriam)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miriam Brooks on behalf of Techno Systems LLC. Attorney Miriam Brooks added to party Techno Systems LLC(pty:dft). (Brooks, Miriam)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Saul Remer on behalf of Techno Systems LLC. Attorney Jason Saul Remer added to party Techno Systems LLC(pty:dft). (Remer, Jason)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Techno Systems LLC. (cds)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Techno Systems LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11668076, filed by Haley Barnett Dacosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)(Levy, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dacosta v. Techno Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Barnett Dacosta
Represented By: Michelle C. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techno Systems LLC
Represented By: Jason Saul Remer
Represented By: Miriam Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?