Gering v. State of Florida
Plaintiff: Robert Gering
Defendant: State of Florida
Case Number: 1:2019cv22115
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document State of Florida. Answer due 8/29/2019. Re: #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert Gering. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/15/2019. (rm01)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 Order to Show Cause, by State of Florida. (Charest-Turken, Gabrielle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabrielle Raemy Charest-Turken on behalf of State of Florida. Attorney Gabrielle Raemy Charest-Turken added to party State of Florida(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit document request) (Charest-Turken, Gabrielle)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/31/2019. (rm01)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Gering. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Declaration in Support)(kpe)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (kpe)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Robert Gering.(kpe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gering v. State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Gabrielle Raemy Charest-Turken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?