Capital Restaurant Group, LLC v. Burger King Corporation
Plaintiff: Capital Restaurant Group, LLC
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv22131
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Capital Restaurant Group, LLC. Replies due by 7/26/2019. (Braunstein, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline as to #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 7/19/2019. SEE DE 11 ORDER (ail)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #10 the Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a response to the Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Plaintiff's response is due on or before July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/15/2019. (jaa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Capital Restaurant Group, LLC. (Braunstein, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Burger King Corporation. Responses due by 7/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Erenbaum, Jessica)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael D Joblove on behalf of Burger King Corporation. Attorney Michael D Joblove added to party Burger King Corporation(pty:dft). (Joblove, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Serell Erenbaum on behalf of Burger King Corporation. Attorney Jessica Serell Erenbaum added to party Burger King Corporation(pty:dft). (Erenbaum, Jessica)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Capital Restaurant Group, LLC re 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Braunstein, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (amb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Burger King Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11675429, filed by Capital Restaurant Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Einhorn, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Restaurant Group, LLC v. Burger King Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Serell Erenbaum
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Restaurant Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael Daniel Braunstein
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?