Rizzo v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sandra Rizzo
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22137
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Sandra Rizzo (Holzberg, Glenn)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Sandra Rizzo (Holzberg, Glenn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISE LINE LTD., Other Affiliate Paul Hehir for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Probst, Bryan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Bryan Edward Probst added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Probst, Bryan)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 7/22/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sandra Rizzo. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Holzberg, Glenn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against Celebrity Cruises, Inc. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Sandra Rizzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice Letter, #2 Exhibit B-Picture)(Holzberg, Glenn)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff, Sandra Rizzo, shall file an amended complaint clarifying the basis of the Court's subject matter jurisdiction and withdrawing her jury trial demand by May 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (mee)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11675805, filed by Sandra Rizzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice Letter, #2 Exhibit B-Picture, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s))(Holzberg, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rizzo v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Edward Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rizzo
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?