Wells Fargo Bank N.A. v. Hinojosa et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Defendant: Ana Hinojosa, Carlos Hinojosa and Ana Maria Hinojosa
Case Number: 1:2019cv22141
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 11:0101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #12 Transmittal Letter Sent. (jao)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 Transmittal Letter Sent with copy of docket sheet and certified Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit Court in Miami, FL. State Court Case Number: 2015-18380-CA-02 (ail)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Remanding Case to State Court Closing Case. Denying as moot #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court And For Fees and Costs filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Cayman Island Branch, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA) Inc. for Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Rosenn, Jonathan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Rosenn, Jonathan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court And For Fees and Costs by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Rosenn, Jonathan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Ana Hinojosa, Carlos Hinojosa re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Other) Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marrero, Julio)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint to Foreclosure of Mortgage) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11676067, filed by Carlos Hinojosa, Ana Hinojosa. State Court Answer Filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Process, Pleadinfs, Orders)(Marrero, Julio) Modified on 5/28/2019 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank N.A. v. Hinojosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Rosenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Hinojosa
Represented By: Julio Cesar Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Hinojosa
Represented By: Julio Cesar Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Maria Hinojosa
Represented By: Julio Cesar Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?