Wilmington Savings Fund Society v. Diaz
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Defendant: Rigoberto Diaz, Jr
Case Number: 1:2019cv22155
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Striking #7 Notice of Change of Address filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Waters, Danielle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Notice of Change of Address. Document Unreadable; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must file a Notice of Striking. (pes)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Danielle Nicole Waters (Waters, Danielle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Change of Address by Danielle Nicole Waters (Waters, Danielle) Modified per DE #10 on 7/10/2019 (pes).
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Parsons, Danielle)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL ANDORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction. Attorneys listed in error by Clerk. (mee)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 5/28/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100188029. (vt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Notice of Removal from State Court to Federal Court) Filing fee $400.00.NOT PAID/NO IFP, filed by Rigoberto Diaz, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society v. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Represented By: Danielle Nicole Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigoberto Diaz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?