Davis v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Keith Davis
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv22263
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1) Factual Proffer, #2 Exhibit (2) Indictment, #3 Exhibit (3) Change of Plea Minutes, #4 Exhibit (4) Plea Agreement, #5 Exhibit (5) Plea Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit (6) Sentencing Transcript, #7 Exhibit (7) Amended Judgment)(Turken, David)
July 26, 2019 Set Deadlines Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2019 Per DE 8 . (vmz)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Other). Re: #6 Order to Show Cause,. Responses due by 7/30/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/26/2019. (ac01)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turken, David)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2255 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order, the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this motion should not be granted and shall file therewith all documents and transcripts necessary for the resolution of this motion regardless of whether or not they are in the Court file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Samuel Turken on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney David Samuel Turken added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:dft). (Turken, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb) Text Modified on 6/3/2019 (amb).
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate, Set aside or Correct Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 17-CR-20584), filed by Keith Davis.(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: David Samuel Turken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?