Johnson v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Teresa Johnson
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv22270
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 6/4/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez). Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge For Final Disposition of Motions. Filed by Teresa Johnson (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Teresa Johnson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gavidia, Cesar)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Teresa Johnson (Gavidia, Cesar)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Philip J. Kantor added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Kantor, Philip)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Teresa Johnson. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Gavidia, Cesar)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (pcs)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11696959, filed by Teresa Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit LTD Policy)(Gavidia, Cesar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Philip J. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Johnson
Represented By: Cesar Gavidia, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Michael Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?