ST. MARTINUS UNIVERSITY, N.V. v. CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC et al

Plaintiff: ST. MARTINUS UNIVERSITY, N.V.
Defendant: CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC, DEREK VAN WALLEGHEM and John Vincent Scalia
Case Number: 1:2019cv22278
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Re: #7 Amended Complaint filed by ST. MARTINUS UNIVERSITY, N.V. Defendants shall file their combined response or separate answers to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 9, 2019. The deadline for compliance with the Order of July 23, 2019 [ECF No. 17] will not be extended. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Amended Complaint for Four Day Extension of Time for All Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint by CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC, John Vincent Scalia, DEREK VAN WALLEGHEM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mora, Martha)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Defendants Caribbean Health Holdings, LLC and Derek Van Walleghem's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Defendants Caribbean Health Holdings, LLC and Derek Van Walleghem shall file their combined response or separate answers to the Amended Complaint by August 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC (Mora, Martha)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Amended Complaint for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC, DEREK VAN WALLEGHEM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mora, Martha)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Oswaldo Mena on behalf of CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC, John Vincent Scalia, DEREK VAN WALLEGHEM. Attorney Daniel Oswaldo Mena added to party CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Oswaldo Mena added to party John Vincent Scalia(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Oswaldo Mena added to party DEREK VAN WALLEGHEM(pty:dft). (Mena, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martha Rosa Mora on behalf of CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC, John Vincent Scalia, DEREK VAN WALLEGHEM. Attorney Martha Rosa Mora added to party CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Martha Rosa Mora added to party John Vincent Scalia(pty:dft), Attorney Martha Rosa Mora added to party DEREK VAN WALLEGHEM(pty:dft). (Mora, Martha)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that on or before September 2, 2019, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendants or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by September 2 will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
June 11, 2019 Case Reopened (ps1)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Reconsideration. The June 7, 2019 Order [ECF No. 8] is SET ASIDE. The Clerk of Court shall REOPEN the case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order Dismissing Case by ST. MARTINUS UNIVERSITY, N.V.. (Saltiel, Moises)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING and Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by ST. MARTINUS UNIVERSITY, N.V..(Saltiel, Moises)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring Amended Complaint by 6/6/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC, DEREK VAN WALLEGHEM. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Vincent Scalia. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11698370, filed by ST. MARTINUS UNIVERSITY, N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saltiel, Moises)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ST. MARTINUS UNIVERSITY, N.V. v. CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARTINUS UNIVERSITY, N.V.
Represented By: Moises Alejandro Saltiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARIBBEAN HEALTH HOLDING, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Oswaldo Mena
Represented By: Martha Rosa Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK VAN WALLEGHEM
Represented By: Daniel Oswaldo Mena
Represented By: Martha Rosa Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vincent Scalia
Represented By: Daniel Oswaldo Mena
Represented By: Martha Rosa Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?