Carr, III v. Junior et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Carr, III
Defendant: Daniel Junior, Enrique Rodriguez and John W. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv22287
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Partial Filing Fee received on 7/10/2019 in the amount of $26.00, receipt number FLS100190664. (asz)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT on or before August 22, 2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this case., ( Amended Complaint due by 8/22/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form) (fbn)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. At this stage of the proceedings, Plaintiff has not established exceptional circumstances warranting the appointment of counsel. However, the Court will consider Plaintiff's motion once his amended complaint is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/9/2019. (rm01)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Raymond Carr, III. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (amb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond Carr, III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency)(amb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Raymond Carr, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr, III v. Junior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Junior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Carr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?