Thompson v. CRST Trucking Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Thompson
Defendant: Miami District Office EEOC, Office Of The Inspector General EEOC, Department of Health and Human Services, CRST Trucking Inc. and Florida Commission on Human Relations
Case Number: 1:2019cv22320
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING and Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CRST Trucking Inc. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Darnell Thompson.(lk)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Vacate a Court #5 Order, by Darnell Thompson. Responses due by 7/2/2019 (kpe)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing suit rights document which gives authority to file a complaint by Darnell Thompson (lk)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended Complaint due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darnell Thompson. (cds)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRST Trucking Inc., Department of Health and Human Services, Florida Commission on Human Relations, Miami District Office EEOC, Office Of The Inspector General EEOC. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Darnell Thompson.(cds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. CRST Trucking Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami District Office EEOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Of The Inspector General EEOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Trucking Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Commission on Human Relations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?