GHO Commercial LLC et al v. HP Digital Studio LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arna Real Estate Holdings, LLC and GHO Commercial LLC
Defendant: HP Digital Studio LLC, Jacqueline Calderin, Marco Contractors, Inc., Cite Condominiums Association, Inc., United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service and Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession of the Subject Property, If Any
Case Number: 1:2019cv22352
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Substitution of Counsel: Attorney Annika Marie Miranda terminated as counsel for Defendant USA;ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion: the USA's Answer filed 7/12/2019 is deemed timely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/12/2019. (EGT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. (Swietlik, Amanda)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Swietlik, Amanda)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Amanda J. Swietlik for Annika Miranda, Carol Ide by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. Attorney Amanda J. Swietlik added to party United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/26/2019 (Swietlik, Amanda)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order And Order Of Referral To Mediation: ( Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 6/2/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 First SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by GHO Commercial LLC (Hornstein, Bruce)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet by United States Attorney)(Miranda, Annika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GHO Commercial LLC et al v. HP Digital Studio LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Digital Studio LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Calderin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cite Condominiums Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Annika Marie Miranda
Represented By: Amanda J. Swietlik
Represented By: Carol Koehleride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession of the Subject Property, If Any
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arna Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bruce Hornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GHO Commercial LLC
Represented By: Bruce Hornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?