Rivette v. United Shore Financial Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Mr. Claude Rivette and Claude Rivette
Defendant: United Shore Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv22399
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Shore Financial Services, LLC. (vmz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Shore Financial Services, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11718341, filed by Claude Rivette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Metsch, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivette v. United Shore Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Claude Rivette
Represented By: Lawrence Richard Metsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Rivette
Represented By: Lawrence Richard Metsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Shore Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?