SCHULTZ v. CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Plaintiff: MATTHEW D SCHULTZ
Defendant: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22423
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Noah Daniel Silverman on behalf of CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. instead of prior counsel of record Nicholas A. Applin. Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Noah Daniel Silverman added to party CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Silverman, Noah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added MATTHEW D SCHULTZ, ARTHUR GARCIA JR.. (Goodman, Lisa)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 1/7/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the two-week period commencing 3/2/2020 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 2/25/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. (Applin, Nicholas)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.. Attorney Nicholas Allen Applin added to party CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.(pty:dft). (Applin, Nicholas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MATTHEW D SCHULTZ. CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Smith, Christopher)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MATTHEW D SCHULTZ (Smith, Christopher)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.. (ebz)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11722008, filed by MATTHEW D SCHULTZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hickey, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHULTZ v. CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Represented By: Noah Daniel Silverman
Represented By: Nicholas Allen Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW D SCHULTZ
Represented By: John Heyward Hickey
Represented By: Christopher Bond Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?