Sirvent v. El Dorado Furniture Corporation
Plaintiff: Laura Sirvent
Defendant: El Dorado Furniture Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv22440
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2019 re #4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by El Dorado Furniture Corporation. Total time in court: 35 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Elvis John Adan appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff; Pablo Luis Crucet, Jr. and Robert Stuart Turk appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Matter taken under advisement. (Digital 10:00:08) (sl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Compliance by El Dorado Furniture Corporation (Crucet, Pablo)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS for 8/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/22/2019. (kmh)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes all pretrial matters pursuant to the parties' Election to Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge for Final Disposition of Motions [ECF No. 9]. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
July 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 5/20/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles). Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 14, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Laura Sirvent (Adan, Elvis)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by El Dorado Furniture Corporation (Crucet, Pablo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by El Dorado Furniture Corporation (Crucet, Pablo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by El Dorado Furniture Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crucet, Pablo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's REPLY to #6 Response to Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law by El Dorado Furniture Corporation. (Crucet, Pablo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Laura Sirvent. Replies due by 7/10/2019. (Adan, Elvis)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before July 10, 2019, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (lfn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by El Dorado Furniture Corporation. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Crucet, Pablo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11724895, filed by El Dorado Furniture Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Turk, Robert) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sirvent v. El Dorado Furniture Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Sirvent
Represented By: Elvis John Adan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Dorado Furniture Corporation
Represented By: Robert Stuart Turk
Represented By: Pablo Luis Crucet, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?