Neira v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Julio Neira
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv22486
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Rogers, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 Initial Disclosure(s) by Julio Neira (Alemany, Joanna)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Initial Disclosure(s) by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Rogers, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Rogers, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER Setting Hearing on #4 Motion. Oral argument regarding Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss will be heard on November 13, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/16/2019. (smz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Response to Motion,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#10]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 6 Order to Show Cause,,, by Julio Neira. (ls)(See Image at DE #7)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Julio Neira. Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Lopez, Anthony)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Julio Neira. (Lopez, Anthony)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Julio Neira. Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Lopez, Anthony)
July 10, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), . Responses due by 7/12/2019 (ls)(per DE #6)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This matter is before the Court on an independent review of the docket. Defendant filed its #4 Motion to Dismiss on June 17, 2019, and Plaintiff's response to the Motion was due no later than July 1, 2019. That date has now passed without any response from Plaintiff. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that no later than July 12, 2019, Plaintiff shall 1) respond to the #4 Motion and 2) show cause why sanctions should not be entered against him. See S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(c) (failure to file a timely response to any motion "may be deemed sufficient cause for granting the motion by default"); Wieckiewicz v. Educ. Credit Mgmt. Corp., 443 F. App'x 449, 450 (11th Cir. 2011) ("Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b), a court has authority to dismiss actions for failure to comply with local rules or obey court orders."). Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/10/2019. (smz)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rogers, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11732456, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Copies of All Process)(Rogers, Robert) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Text Modified on 6/14/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neira v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew P. Rock
Represented By: Robert Lee Rogers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Neira
Represented By: Joanna M Alemany
Represented By: Anthony Manuel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?