Robinson v. Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Robinson
Defendant: Guillermo Rico, George Rico and Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv22488
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 36 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by James Robinson (Attachments: #1 Joint Scheduling Order)(Sardina, Gustavo)
August 7, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James Robinson. Replies due by 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sardina, Gustavo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by George Rico, Guillermo Rico, Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Sanchelima, Jesus)
July 18, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline per Order DE# 33 : George Rico response due 7/24/2019; Guillermo Rico response due 7/24/2019; Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC response due 7/24/2019. (lh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time. Response/Answer now due on July 24, 2019. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/18/2019. (abu)
July 17, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by George Rico, Guillermo Rico, Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. (Sanchelima, Jesus)
July 10, 2019 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by James Robinson (Sardina, Gustavo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by George Rico, Guillermo Rico, Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. (Sanchelima, Jesus)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion for Extension of Time. Post-hearing submissions from both parties shall be filed by July 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/3/2019. (EGT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to supplement briefing in support of motion for temporary and preliminary injunctions re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by George Rico, Guillermo Rico, Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. Replies due by 7/10/2019. (Sanchelima, Jesus)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to supplement briefing in support of motion for temporary and preliminary injunctions re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by James Robinson. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sardina, Gustavo)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Evidentiary Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 held on 6/26/2019. Witness: James Robinson, George Rico testified. Court Reporter: Vernita Allen-Williams, 305-523-5048 / Vernita_Allen-Williams@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mdc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #12 EXPEDITED MOTION Expedited Injunction re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by James Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Sardina, Gustavo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by George Rico, Guillermo Rico, Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. (Sanchelima, Jesus)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 HEARING EXHIBITS A, B by George Rico, Guillermo Rico, Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in Defendants' Response to Motion, #2 Exhibit B in Defendants' Response to Motion)(Sanchelima, Jesus)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by George Rico, Guillermo Rico, Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. Attorney Jesus Sanchelima added to party George Rico(pty:dft), Attorney Jesus Sanchelima added to party Guillermo Rico(pty:dft). Replies due by 7/2/2019. (Sanchelima, Jesus)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the Courtroom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (abu)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by James Robinson. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sardina, Gustavo)
June 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per Order DE# 16 as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction,( Responses due by 6/25/2019 at 5:00pm), Set/Reset Hearings as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, ( Evidentiary Hearing re-set for 6/26/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres.) (lh)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by James Robinson re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #12 EXPEDITED MOTION Expedited Injunction re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Declaration of James Robinson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Sardina, Gustavo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS AMENDED ORDER re [D.E. 15] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Upon review of the record on the motion (and also necessary to correct scheduling errors in the original Order), the Court finds good cause to expedite a response date and an evidentiary hearing on the motion. Witnesses with knowledge of the creation and marketing of the alleged infringing product shall be produced for testimony at the hearing. Response to motion, together with supporting affidavits, due by 6/25/2019 at 5:00 p.m.Evidentiary Hearing re-set for 6/26/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres, United States Courthouse, James Lawrence King Bldg., Courtroom 5 - Tenth Floor, 99 N.E. 4th Street, Miami, Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/21/2019. (EGT)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference, And ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (lh)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Upon review of the record on the motion, the Court finds good cause to expedite a response date and an evidentiary hearing on the motion. Witnesses with knowledge of the creation and marketing of the alleged infringing product shall be produced for testimony at the hearing. Response to motion, together with supporting affidavits, due by 6/19/2019 at 5:00 p.m. Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/27/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres, United States Courthouse, James Lawrence King Bldg., Courtroom 5 - Tenth Floor, 99 N.E. 4th Street, Miami, Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/19/2019. (EGT)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER referring the Plaintiff's expedited motion for temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction #11 #12 to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for an order or a report and recommendations, consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1 of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesus Sanchelima on behalf of Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. Attorney Jesus Sanchelima added to party Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC(pty:dft). (Sanchelima, Jesus)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 Supplemental To EXPEDITED MOTION Expedited Injunction re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by James Robinson. (Sardina, Gustavo) TextModified on 6/20/2019 (cqs).
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 7/3/2019) by James Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Sardina, Gustavo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC. by James Robinson (Sardina, Gustavo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Civil Cover Sheet. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) for Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC cannot be issued. Pro Se party's return address is not listed (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to George Rico, Guillermo Rico. (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Complaint) (vmz)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11732994, filed by James Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summon(s) Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC, #10 Summon(s) George Rico, #11 Summon(s) Guillermo Rico)(Sardina, Gustavo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Rico
Represented By: Jesus Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Rico
Represented By: Jesus Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz Tobacco, LLC
Represented By: Jesus Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robinson
Represented By: Gustavo Sardina
Represented By: Frank Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?