Tobkin v. Florida Prepaid College Board
Appellant: Donald Alan Tobkin
Appellee: Florida Prepaid College Board
Case Number: 1:2019cv22520
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel Mediation MOTION for Temporary Relinquishment if Jurisdiction to the Below Bankruptcy Court to Facilitate Mediation filed by Florida Prepaid College Board. Replies due by 8/21/2019. (Kosches, Jordan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Florida Prepaid College Board (Kosches, Jordan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/3/2019. (bb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Donald Alan Tobkin (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation, #3 Appellee's Designation)(dcn)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donald Alan Tobkin identifying Other Affiliate Gray Robinson, P.A., Other Affiliate Laurel Meyerson Isicoff, Other Affiliate Steven Jon Solomon for Donald Alan Tobkin. (ar2)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Abatement ( Responses due by 8/14/2019), MOTION to Compel Mediation ( Responses due by 8/14/2019), and MOTION for Temporary Relinquishment of Jurisdiction to the below Bankruptcy Court to Facilitate Mediation by Donald Alan Tobkin. (ar2)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 3 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,. US Mail returned for: Donald Alan Tobkin. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Donald Alan Tobkin (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 11-34669-LMI, pursuant to Granted Motion for Leave - USDC Case Number: 16-cv-24558-JEM, filed by Donald Alan Tobkin.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobkin v. Florida Prepaid College Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald Alan Tobkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Florida Prepaid College Board
Represented By: Jordan Scott Kosches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?