DIOSSY v. SHERRY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.

Plaintiff: AMBRUS DIOSSY
Defendant: SHERRY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22569
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by SHERRY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Diamond, Keith)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 8/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2019., Discovery due by 2/11/2020., Expert Discovery due by 2/11/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 10/4/2019., Mediation Deadline 2/25/2020., In Limine Motions due by 3/4/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2020., Motions due by 3/4/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/25/2020., Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 6/2/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to the Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint on or before August 12, 2019. Answer/response due 8/12/2019 re: #1 Complaint, filed by AMBRUS DIOSSY. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by SHERRY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. Attorney Keith Douglas Diamond added to party SHERRY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.(pty:dft). (Diamond, Keith)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Richard P. Liebowitz, mailing date June 24, 2019, (pt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (mailed to copyright office) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SHERRY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (mee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHERRY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11751516, filed by AMBRUS DIOSSY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Sanchelima, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIOSSY v. SHERRY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Represented By: Keith Douglas Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBRUS DIOSSY
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?