SOS Furniture Company, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: SOS Furniture Company, Inc.
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22606
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 6:19-cv-01248, filed 07/09/2019. (jua)
July 9, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:19-cv-22606 electronically transferred out to Florida Middle. (asl)
June 28, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. The Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court, Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division, and mark this CLOSED in this District. (ps1)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court, Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division, and mark this CLOSED in this District. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Change Venue by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 7/12/2019 (Quinn, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT (REMOVAL) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Quinn, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Striking #5 Status Report filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Quinn, Robert) Modified Text on 7/1/2019 (ls).
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Status Report. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ps1)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT (REMOVAL) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Quinn, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 7/5/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11757029, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Quinn, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOS Furniture Company, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOS Furniture Company, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Michael McKown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert M. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?