Quiroga v. BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Quiroga
Defendant: BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC and MARIA OLIVERA
Case Number: 1:2019cv22607
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's RESPONSE to #12 Statement of Claim by BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC, MARIA OLIVERA. (Cedrez, Claudio)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Statement of: Claim by Ricardo Quiroga (Adan, Elvis)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Ricardo Quiroga. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Adan, Elvis)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC, MARIA OLIVERA. Replies due by 8/14/2019. (Cedrez, Claudio)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff has failed to fully comply with S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). Counsel shall identify with specificity the reasonable efforts to confer (including the date, time, and manner of each effort). The Motion is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/6/2019. (jdo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Ricardo Quiroga. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Adan, Elvis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudio R. Cedrez on behalf of BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC, MARIA OLIVERA (Cedrez, Claudio)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC, MARIA OLIVERA. Attorney Claudio R. Cedrez added to party BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Claudio R. Cedrez added to party MARIA OLIVERA(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/6/2019 (Cedrez, Claudio)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Fair Labor Standards Act, 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq. ("FLSA"). In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED to comply with the following procedures: Under Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a plaintiff is required to state a "short and plain statement of the claim." While this Rule places only a light burden on a plaintiff, the Court requires complaints filed under the FLSA to include, at a minimum, a statement setting forth the following with respect to each Plaintiff: (a) An initial estimate of the total amount of alleged unpaid wages; (b) A preliminary calculation of such wages; (c) The approximate period during which the alleged FLSA violations occurred; and (d) The nature of the wages (e.g., overtime or straight time). Plaintiff is directed to file a "Statement of Claim" by July 10, 2019. Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order, the Statement of Claim, and copies of all supporting documents (including time sheets, pay stubs, etc.) upon counsel for Defendants once an appearance has been made or at the time the Statement of Claim is filed (if defense counsel has already appeared). Defendants shall then file a "Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim" setting forth in detail any defenses to Plaintiff's claim(s) and serve copies of all supporting documents within twenty (20) days of being served with Plaintiff's Statement of Claim. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC, MARIA OLIVERA. (mee)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11757146, filed by Ricardo Quiroga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Adan, Elvis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroga v. BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONAFIDE BAKERY & COFFEE, LLC
Represented By: Claudio R. Cedrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA OLIVERA
Represented By: Claudio R. Cedrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Quiroga
Represented By: Elvis John Adan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?