Sanchez et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: SANCHEZ PEDRO, MARLENIS SANCHEZ and Pedro Sanchez
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv22610
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Cases associated per #10 Order. (asl)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case Nos. 19-22125-CIV-GAYLES, 19-22222-CIV-GAYLES, and 19-22610-CIV-GAYLES foradministrative purposes only. All future filings in this case shall be made under Case No. 19-21893-CIV-GAYLES only. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 8/5/2019. Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer for Consolidation Purposes with Memorandum of Law and Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related, or Similar Actions by United States of America. (Preamble, Bradley)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by United States of America. Attorney Bradley J. Preamble added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Preamble, Bradley)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Marlenis Sanchez, Pedro Sanchez. United States of America served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Rash, David)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge, referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all non-dispositive pretrial and discovery motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America.(pes)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Wrongful Death against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11757618, filed by MARLENIS SANCHEZ, SANCHEZ PEDRO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Rash, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANCHEZ PEDRO
Represented By: David Charles Rash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLENIS SANCHEZ
Represented By: David Charles Rash
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Sanchez
Represented By: David Charles Rash
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Bradley J. Preamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?