Stearns Bank National Association v. Big Slick Investment, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Stearns Bank National Association
Defendant: Raul Barrios-Hernandez, Carolina S. Cheda, Elena R. Hernandez and Big Slick Investment, Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22637
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Big Slick Investment, Corp. response due 8/23/2019. per DE 12 (cbr)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must respond to the Complaint by August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/2/2019. (chd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Big Slick Investment, Corp. for dates of 8/8/19 to 9/8/19 (Shoot, Lawrence)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to complaint by 9/23/2019 re #1 Complaint, by Big Slick Investment, Corp.. Attorney Lawrence Michael Shoot added to party Big Slick Investment, Corp.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/13/2019 (Shoot, Lawrence)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stearns Bank National Association. Raul Barrios-Hernandez served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Dunn, Sara)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stearns Bank National Association. Big Slick Investment, Corp. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Dunn, Sara)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stearns Bank National Association. Carolina S. Cheda served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Dunn, Sara)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Marty Bell. Certification of Location of Original Promissory Note by Stearns Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunn, Sara)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Goldberg Raines on behalf of Stearns Bank National Association (Raines, Lauren)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Raul Barrios-Hernandez, Big Slick Investment, Corp., Carolina S. Cheda, Elena R. Hernandez. (mee)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Replevin, Foreclosure and Other Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11762223, filed by Stearns Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G)(Dunn, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stearns Bank National Association v. Big Slick Investment, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stearns Bank National Association
Represented By: Sara Drennen Dunn
Represented By: Lauren Goldberg Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Barrios-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina S. Cheda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena R. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Slick Investment, Corp.
Represented By: Lawrence Michael Shoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?