METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION v. Teamsters Local Union 769.,
Plaintiff: METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union 769.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv22649
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Teamsters Local Union 769., re #24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re #6 Order per 3, Request for Hearing, 27 Order Referring Motion, as To Parties' Agreement on Withdrawal of Request for Evid. Hearing (w/o Prejudice) (Braswell, D.)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER referring the Plaintiff's motion for an evidentiary hearing #24 , the Plaintiff's petition to vacate #1 , and the Defendant's petition to confirm #13 to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for either an order or a report and recommendations, consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1 of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (js02)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #19 Motion to Stay. Apart from being moot now that the reply has been filed in support of the petition, the requested delay is also denied on the merits. If the pending motion for leave to conduct discovery is granted, the Court may then allow Plaintiff to supplement the record on the petition with any evidence obtained in that discovery. Because there are overarching legal issues that the Court may have to resolve beforehand, completion of the briefing on the original Petition will facilitate the speedy and orderly resolution of the dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/31/2019. (EGT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re #6 Order per 3, Request for Hearing by METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION. (Beutler, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 Plaintiff's REPLY to #13 Response/Reply (Other) Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award by METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION. (Beutler, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay re #6 Order briefing deadlines, #9 Corrected MOTION for Discovery permit limited expedited discovery filed by METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION. (Zaffuto, Warren)
July 26, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay re #6 Order briefing deadlines, #9 Corrected MOTION for Discovery permit limited expedited discovery filed by Teamsters Local Union 769.,. Replies due by 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (CV-Arb. Humphries))(Braswell, D.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER referring the Plaintiff's motion to adjust briefing deadlines related to the parties' petitions to vacate and confirm #19 to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres to be heard and determined, consistent with the Court's earlier referral of the motion for limited discovery 10 , 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Judge Torres may amend, or not amend, the briefing schedule in this case #6 as he sees fit. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay re #6 Order briefing deadlines by METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION. Responses due by 8/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beutler, Mark)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Re: #9 Corrected MOTION for Limited Discovery, for good cause shown: Defendant's Response now due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/23/2019. (EGT)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER referring the Defendants' motion for extension of time to respond to motion for limited discovery #14 to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres to be heard and determined, consistent with the Court's earlier referral of the motion for limited discovery 10 , 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
July 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Corrected MOTION for Discovery permit limited expedited discovery filed by METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION. Replies due by 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email between counsel)(Beutler, Mark)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Corrected MOTION for Discovery permit limited expedited discovery by Teamsters Local Union 769.,. (Braswell, D.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's RESPONSE to #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award, and Motion to Confirm Award by Teamsters Local Union 769.,. (Braswell, D.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres per DE 10 . Motions referred to Judge Edwin G. Torres. (vjk)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot the Petitioner's motion to permit limited expedited discovery #8 . The Petitioner's corrected motion #9 moots the original motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER referring Petitioner's motion to permit limited expedited discovery #9 to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres to be heard and determined, consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corrected MOTION for Discovery permit limited expedited discovery by METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beutler, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Discovery Permit limited expedited discovery by METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beutler, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard S. Susskind on behalf of Teamsters Local Union 769.,. Attorney Howard S. Susskind added to party Teamsters Local Union 769.,(pty:dft). (Susskind, Howard)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on Service & Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Teamsters Local Union 769. (lbc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION (Zaffuto, Warren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (cds)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate Arbitration Award. Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 113C-11763608, filed by METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Zaffuto, Warren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION v. Teamsters Local Union 769.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union 769.,
Represented By: Howard S. Susskind
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: METROPOLITAN DELIVERY CORPORATION
Represented By: Warren Daniel Zaffuto
Represented By: Mark J. Beutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?