Macklin v. Inch

Plaintiff: Jerdy Macklin
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Case Number: 1:2019cv22718
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabrielle Raemy Charest-Turken on behalf of Mark S. Inch. Attorney Gabrielle Raemy Charest-Turken added to party Mark S. Inch(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit document request) (Charest-Turken, Gabrielle)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before September 1, 2019, the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 9/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $5.00. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerdy Macklin. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement)(pcs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Jerdy Macklin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macklin v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Gabrielle Raemy Charest-Turken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerdy Macklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?