Cherry v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: James Cherry, III
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2019cv22730
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections re #8 Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Transcripts 1-51, #2 Transcripts 52-220, #3 Transcripts 221-382, #4 Transcripts 383-556, #5 Transcripts 557-794, #6 Transcripts 795-1092, #7 Transcripts 1093-1307, #8 Transcripts 1-34) (Ali, Asad)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 APPENDIX to #8 Response to Order to Show Cause by Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Exhibit 16-35)(Ali, Asad)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, by Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. (Ali, Asad)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Asad Ali on behalf of Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Asad Ali added to party Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Ali, Asad)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before August 1, 2019, the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 8/5/2019. Motions due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Inquiry/Request for Case Status by James Cherry, III Re: #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (ar2)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ar2)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Not paid/No IFP), filed by James Cherry, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ar2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Asad Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cherry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?