Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 23.121.19.235
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 23.121.19.235
Case Number: 1:2019cv22742
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (kpe)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Final Order of Dismissal and Order Denying All Pending Motions as Moot. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/24/2019 for Judge Federico Moreno. See attached document for full details. (ap00)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of John Doe by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (kpe) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/3/2019) (kpe).
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 23.121.19.235. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11785044, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 23.121.19.235
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 23.121.19.235
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?