Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 72.28.144.205

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 72.28.144.205
Case Number: 1:2019cv22745
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave for Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave for Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit E Proposed Order)(Walker, Rachel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits) (jao)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 72.28.144.205. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11785175, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 72.28.144.205
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 72.28.144.205
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?