Canga Cortes v. Universal Music Latino et al
Plaintiff: Newton Enrique Canga Cortes
Defendant: Universal Music Latino, Erika Ender, Ramon L. Ayala and Luis Alfonso Rodriguez Lopez
Case Number: 1:2019cv22813
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (js02)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Newton Enrique Canga Cortes. (cqs)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 Letter/Method of Service from Newton Enrique Canga Cortes. (ebz) Modified on 7/29/2019 (mr1).
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ramon L. Ayala, Erika Ender, Luis Alfonso Rodriguez Lopez, Universal Music Latino. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Newton Enrique Canga Cortes to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: newtoncase74@gmail.com (ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 INSTRUCTION TO PRO SE LITIGANTS Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/16/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100191102. (vt)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Newton Enrique Canga Cortes. Case not filed with required filing fees of $400 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a), and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Check submitted by filer not signed. Summons(es) will not be issued until the filing fee is paid or an order granting the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is entered. (jas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ramon L. Ayala, Erika Ender, Luis Alfonso Rodriguez Lopez, Universal Music Latino. Filing fees $ 400.00, Not Paid, filed by Newton Enrique Canga Cortes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jas) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (jas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canga Cortes v. Universal Music Latino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Ender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon L. Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Alfonso Rodriguez Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newton Enrique Canga Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?