1758691 Ontario, Inc. v. American Fruit & Produce, Corp et al
Plaintiff: 1758691 Ontario, Inc t/a ATV Farms and 1758691 Ontario, Inc.
Defendant: American Fruit & Produce, Corp and Hugo J Acosta, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22824
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Administrative Order upon Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Closing Case. All future hearings are CANCELLED and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to all Defendants by 1758691 Ontario, Inc. (Barmat, Marc)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STRIKING #16 Stipulation filed by 1758691 Ontario, Inc. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 STRIKEN per Order DE#18 -STIPULATION and Order of Settlement by 1758691 Ontario, Inc. (Barmat, Marc) Modified on 8/27/2019 (drz).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Cancelling The Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 08/30/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Entry of Default as to American Fruit & Produce, Corp., Hugo J. Acosta, Jr. per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default Re: #14 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/22/2019. (drz)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default(s) as to Hugo J Acosta, Jr, American Fruit & Produce, Corp. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 12 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by 1758691 Ontario, Inc.. Hugo J Acosta, Jr served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019; American Fruit & Produce, Corp served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (See DE# {11} for image). (jas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by 1758691 Ontario, Inc.. Hugo J Acosta, Jr served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; American Fruit & Produce, Corp served on 7/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Barmat, Marc)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHDEULING CONFERENCE: Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/16/2019 Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2019 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 7 Scheduling Order,. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 19-CV-22924. (drz)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hugo J Acosta, Jr. (drz)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Fruit & Produce, Corp. (drz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11797295, filed by 1758691 Ontario, Inc t/a ATV Farms. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit PACA License_ATV, #5 Exhibit PACA license_American Fruit, #6 Exhibit Invoices)(Barmat, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1758691 Ontario, Inc. v. American Fruit & Produce, Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Fruit & Produce, Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo J Acosta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1758691 Ontario, Inc t/a ATV Farms
Represented By: Marc Philip Barmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1758691 Ontario, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Philip Barmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?