Crespo v. F.B.I.
Plaintiff: Alvaro de Jesus Crespo
Defendant: F.B.I.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22857
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by F.B.I.. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party F.B.I.(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U.S. Attorney's Office filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (mee)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to FBI, Miami Field Officer filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (mee)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to F.B.I.. (jao)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Alvaro de Jesus Crespo to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: alvarokrespo@hotmail.com (cqs)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(cqs)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against F.B.I., filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cqs)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Complaint filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. Plaintiff has until July 24, 2019 to file an amended complaint that remedies the defects identified in this Order, along with the proper filing fee, or an affidavit to support proceeding without prepaying costs. If Plaintiff re-files an IFP Application, such affidavit must include an explanation of his lack of income, given Plaintiff lists a Miami address (see Compl. 1), while failing to disclose how he pays for necessities such as rent and food. All other pending motions are DENIED as premature. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (ar2)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (ar2)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F.B.I. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ar2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crespo v. F.B.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B.I.
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro de Jesus Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?