Clover Systems, LLC v. Log-Net, Inc.
Plaintiff: Clover Systems, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Log-Net, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Holly Anna Olivares, Clover Logistics de RL and Luis Alonso Rincon
Case Number: 1:2019cv22902
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Setting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2019., Discovery due by 5/19/2020., Expert Discovery due by 5/19/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 10/28/2019., Mediation Deadline 6/2/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/10/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2020., Motions due by 6/10/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/31/2020., Jury Trial set for 12/14/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/8/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.)( Mediation Deadline 6/2/2020.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Log-Net, Inc. (Dahl, Patrick)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Clover Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gutman, Ariella)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clover Logistics de RL identifying Corporate Parent Clover, LLC for Clover Logistics de RL (Gutman, Ariella)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clover Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RINCON FAMILY HOLDINGS, LLC, Corporate Parent Clover, LLC for Clover Systems, LLC, Clover Systems, LLC (Gutman, Ariella)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Answer and Counterclaim. Clover Systems, LLC, Clover Logistics s de RL., Holly Ana Olivares, and Luis Alonso Rincon shall file their responses by October 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/23/2019. (mpn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Log-Net, Inc.. Replies due by 8/30/2019. (Dahl, Patrick)
August 22, 2019 Set Deadlines per DE 16 Order as to #15 MOTION for Extension of Time. Responses due by 8/23/2019 (kpe)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Defendant's expedited response by August 23, 2019, to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Answer and Counterclaim, ECF No. #15 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/22/2019. (mpn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Clover Logistics de RL, Clover Systems, LLC, Log-Net, Inc., Holly Anna Olivares, Luis Alonso Rincon. Attorney Ariella Joselyn Gutman added to party Log-Net, Inc.(pty:3pp). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gutman, Ariella)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ariella Joselyn Gutman on behalf of Clover Logistics de RL, Clover Systems, LLC, Holly Anna Olivares, Luis Alonso Rincon. Attorney Ariella Joselyn Gutman added to party Clover Logistics de RL(pty:3pd), Attorney Ariella Joselyn Gutman added to party Clover Systems, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Ariella Joselyn Gutman added to party Clover Systems, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ariella Joselyn Gutman added to party Holly Anna Olivares(pty:3pd), Attorney Ariella Joselyn Gutman added to party Luis Alonso Rincon(pty:3pd). (Gutman, Ariella)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Karen Painter Randall. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Andrew C. Sayles. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Leo J. Hurley, Jr.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Clover Logistics de RL, Luis Alonso Rincon, Holly Anna Olivares, COUNTERCLAIM against Clover Systems, LLC by Log-Net, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 4.10.19 Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 7.2.19 Letter)(Dahl, Patrick)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Karen Painter Randall. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11880503 by Log-Net, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification K. Randall Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order K. Randall Pro Hac Order)(Dahl, Patrick)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew C. Sayles. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11880497 by Log-Net, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification A. Sayles Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order A. Sayles Proposed Order)(Dahl, Patrick)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Leo J. Hurley, Jr. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11880488 by Log-Net, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Pro Hac Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Hurley Pro Hac Order)(Dahl, Patrick)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick K Dahl on behalf of Log-Net, Inc.. Attorney Patrick K Dahl added to party Log-Net, Inc.(pty:dft). (Dahl, Patrick)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Clover Systems, LLC. Clover Systems, LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Turner, Paul)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Log-Net, Inc.. (cds)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Log-Net, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11809091, filed by Clover Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2 - Letter, #5 Exhibit 3 - Letter)(Turner, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clover Systems, LLC v. Log-Net, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clover Systems, LLC
Represented By: Paul Dewey Turner
Represented By: Benjamin Lawrence Reiss
Represented By: Ariella Joselyn Gutman
Represented By: Nima Tahmassebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Log-Net, Inc.
Represented By: Ariella Joselyn Gutman
Represented By: Patrick K Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Holly Anna Olivares
Represented By: Ariella Joselyn Gutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Clover Logistics de RL
Represented By: Ariella Joselyn Gutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Luis Alonso Rincon
Represented By: Ariella Joselyn Gutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?