Zeno v. Lexington Insurance Comapany
Plaintiff: Marisol Zeno
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Comapany
Case Number: 1:2019cv22905
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to William Berk in the amount of $400.00 on 07/18/2019 re 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (mua)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - Duplicate case. See 19-cv-22898-CMA - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Amount $400.00, receipt #113C-11809332, case filed date: 7/12/2019. No further entries will be made on this case. (pes) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (pes).
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11809332, filed by Lexington Insurance Comapany. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Civil Cover Sheet and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Notice of Service of Process, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Miami-Dade Office of the Property Appraiser Detailed Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Declaration in Support of Removal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5-Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6-Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7-Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8-Correspondence, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9-Civil Action Summons, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10-Agreed Order on Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11-Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12-Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13-Defendant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14-Agreed Order on Defendant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15-Defendant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16-Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17-Defendant's Third Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18-Agreed Order on Defendant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19-Agreed Order on Defendant's Third Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20-Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21-Defendant's Notice of Serving Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22-Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23-Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 24-Defendant's Notice of Serving First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25-Defendant's First Request for Production to Plaintiff, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26-Defendant's Amended Response to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 27-Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 28-Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request for Production to Plaintiff, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 29-Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Jurat Page)(Sims, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeno v. Lexington Insurance Comapany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Zeno
Represented By: Gregory Saldamando
Represented By: Jennifer Scarlet Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Comapany
Represented By: Melissa M. Sims
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Genden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?