Woodard-CM, LLC v. Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Woodard-CM, LLC
Defendant: Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22907
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Woodard-CM, LLC (Mendez, Meredith)
August 30, 2019 ***Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. per DE #27 (cbr)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 30, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Settlement by Woodard-CM, LLC (Mendez, Meredith)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Amended Complaint due by 9/4/2019. Status Report due by 9/11/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 28, 2019 Filing 24 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2019 re #22 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint filed by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Total time in court: 16 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): David H. Pollack, Zixuan Zhou, Oliver Alan Ruiz, Meredith Frank Mendez, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mh00)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE telephonic status re: jurisdictional discovery, #22 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint: The parties may appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above. The access code is 3156459 and the password is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A CELL PHONE OR A SPEAKER PHONE. Telephonic Hearing set for 8/28/2019 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Pollack, David)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER STRIKING #17 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Zixuan Zhou. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11904470 by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Responses due by 8/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. (Pollack, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 Initial Disclosure(s) by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. (Pollack, David)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Calendar Call set for 6/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Bench Trial set for 6/22/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. ), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 2/11/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Defendant, Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. shall comply with the July 19, 2019 Order by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Woodard-CM, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Litex Industries, Limited for Woodard-CM, LLC (Ruiz, Oliver)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Woodard-CM, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ruiz, Oliver)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. Answer due 8/20/2019. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Woodard-CM, LLC. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, David)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer due to the failure to submit a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Attorney David H. Pollack added to party Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, David)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Woodard-CM, LLC. Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Ruiz, Oliver)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (mee)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. (mee)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11809481, filed by Woodard-CM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Ruiz, Oliver)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard-CM, LLC v. Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodard-CM, LLC
Represented By: Oliver Alan Ruiz
Represented By: Meredith Frank Mendez
Represented By: Peter Anthony Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Pollack
Represented By: Zixuan Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?