Martin v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jahmal Akeem Martin
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv22931
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #5 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant, #6 Order to Show Cause,. US Mail returned for: Jahmal Akeem Martin. Updated address found and document resent to new address. RRM OrlandoRESIDENTIAL REENTRY OFFICE6303 COUNTY ROAD 500WILDWOOD, FL 34785 (mp)
September 8, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Vacate filed by United States of America. Replies due by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hernandez, Yeney)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yeney Hernandez on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Yeney Hernandez added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Hernandez, Yeney)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2255 on or before September 9, 2019, the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this motion should not be granted, and shall file therewith all documents and transcripts necessary for the resolution of this motion regardless of whether or not they are in the Court file. Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER construing the filing, docketed as entry no. #3 , as Movant's memorandum in support of the #1 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2255(f)(3) IN LIGHT OF UNITED STATES V. DAVIS by Jahmal Akeem Martin. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (pcs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 10-cr-20896), filed by Jahmal Akeem Martin.(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jahmal Akeem Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: Yeney Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?